Εικόνες σελίδας
PDF
Ηλεκτρ. έκδοση

171. Written Problems.

1. A man bought 4 cows. For one he paid $ 27, for another $32, for another $ 36, for another $ 40. How much did he pay for the four cows ?

2. At $32 each, what will be the cost of 4 cows ?

3. Can you find the cost of the cows in the first problem by multiplication ?

4. Can you find the cost of the cows in the second problem by addition ?

5. When can you use either addition or multiplication to find the cost of cows ?

6. When you can use either addition or multiplication, which is the better to use? Why?

7. A man bought a farm for $3675, and sold it for $5000. Did he gain or lose, and how many dollars ?

8. A man bought 6 sheep at $3 each and sold them for $25. Did he gain or lose, and how much ?

9. A farmer owned 1860 acres of land. He divided his land into 3 farms, with the same number of acres in each. How many acres were there in each of the farms ?

10. At $4 each, how many sheep can be bought for $ 128 ?

11. At $5 each, how many barrels of flour can be bought for $65 ?

12. At 23¢ a yard, what will be the cost of 6 yards of cloth ?

172. Oral Problems.

1. How many halves are there in 1 apple? In 1 circle? In 1 dollar? In 1 day?

2. How many halves are there in 2 apples ? In 2, apples? In 3 apples? In 31 apples ? In 42 days ?

3. How many apples must be cut into halves in order to get apples ? g apples? g apples ?

4. Tell how many whole apples each of the following is equal to : apples, z apples, į apples.

5. A man paid 4 boys į dollar each for helping him on a Saturday. How many dollars did he pay them all ?

6. There were 8 children at a party. A lady gave one half of an orange to each. How many oranges did she give to all ?

7. 24 apples = apples; apples - apples; 31 apples = apples. 8. 41 days = days; 5.1 dollars = , dollars. 3

. 9. 61 feet = feet; 12 inches = inches. 10. apples apples; } oranges - oranges.

11. Tell how many half apples each of the following is equal to: 2 apples, 2.1

, apples, 4 apples, 41 apples, 51 apples, 31 apples, 6 apples.

, 12. Seven half dollars are equal to how many dollars ?

13. A girl spent 5 half days in the city. How much more than 2 days did she spend there?

[ocr errors]
[ocr errors]

1

173. Drill Exercises.

6. 6 x 2 is read, 6 multiplied by 2. It is the saine as

x2 Supply products for x, and add to each product the number above the column as in a : 12, 14; 16, 18. Give answers only: (2) (3)

(5) (7) b

d 1.6x2=12, 14 8x2=16, 19 7x3 = 3 x 2 = x

х 2. 4x4=16, 18 4 x 3 = x 2 x 5 x 5 x 3= x

=

= 3. 5x2=X

6 x 3=3

4 x2=x 3 x 4= x 4. 3 x 3=x 7 X 2=

3 x 5 = x 2 x 6= x 5. 2 x 3=x 3 x 6=x 9 X 2=X 2x 8 = x

x x

2.x8X

a

с

=

[ocr errors]

a

с

174. Drill Exercises.
Supply quotients in place of x.

b
1. 18:3= 12.4=x 16:2=X
2. 147 = x

18:6=x 18.9=2 3. 21+3= x X 16:8=x 15+3=2

d 193= 11:2=2 13:6='c

[blocks in formation]

a

e

m

7 6

176. Oral Exercises.
Add each column as indicated in Step C, p. 49.
b
d
f 9

h i j E 1 3 9 8 7 6 6 1 7 6 9 9 5

3 2 4. 1 3 9 3 4 1 3 5 5 7 8 6 9 7 8 7 1 4 6 7 7 5 9 3 8 4. 2 3 9 6 4 4. 5 3 2 4 1 5 8 6 8 7 8 6 5 7 8 6 9 5 4 4 2 3 2 8 4 8 9 7 8

9 8 2 2 7 9 8 6 7 8 9 6 5 8 9 8 6 9

[ocr errors]
[ocr errors]
[ocr errors]
[ocr errors]
[ocr errors]
[ocr errors]

CO

los

Name five combinations whose sums are ten.

When these combinations occur in a column, they may be taken together. Exercise a above may be added : 12, 22, 29, 39, 42. Add the above exercises in a similar manner.

[blocks in formation]

178. Oral Exercises.
Add a column of ten 3's; of five 4's; of five 5's.

[merged small][ocr errors][merged small][merged small][merged small][merged small][merged small][merged small][merged small][merged small][merged small]

1st BK IRITU-9

[merged small][merged small][ocr errors][merged small][merged small][merged small][ocr errors][ocr errors][merged small][merged small][merged small]

Study the above exercises until you can give the products without hesitation.

Give the products, from right to left; adding 4 to each product; adding 6 to each product.

180. Multiply 3457 by 23. MODEL: 3457 Multiply 3457 first by 3, and

23 write the product. Next, multiply 10371 by 2. Two 7's are 14. Write the 6914 4 under the 2. After completing 79511 the multiplication by 2, draw a

line and add the products.

19. 3223 x 89

х
20. 2130 x 98
21. 3231 x 89

181. Written Exercises.
Multiply :
1. 3457 x 23 10. 3243 x 45
2. 6789 x 23 11. 4545 x 54
3. 9876 x 32 12. 3454 x 45
4. 5647 x 32

13. 2050 x 54 5. 8975 x 23

14. 3524 x 54 6. 3240 x 35 15. 2320 x 67

Х 7. 6978 x 32 16. 3023 x 67 8. 4036 x 23 17. 1323 x 67 9. 9380 x 32 18. 2032 x 67

22. 3020 x 98 23. 3123 x 84 24. 2323 x 29 25. 4534 x 15 26. 3750 x 13 27. 4567 x 20

« ΠροηγούμενηΣυνέχεια »